Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 02/12/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/12/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/12/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/12/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/12/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/12/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 02/12/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/12/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/12/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/12/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/12/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/12/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/12/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/12/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/12/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/12/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/12/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/12/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/12/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/12/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/12/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/12/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/12/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/12/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/12/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/12/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/12/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/12/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/26/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/26/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/26/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/26/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/06/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/06/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/06/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/06/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/06/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/06/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/06/1997
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/20/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/20/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/20/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/20/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/20/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 03/20/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/20/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/17/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/17/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/17/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/17/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/17/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/17/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 04/17/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/17/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/17/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/17/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/17/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/24/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/24/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/24/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/06/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/06/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 05/06/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/06/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/14/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/14/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/15/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/15/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/15/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/15/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/22/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/03/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/03/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/04/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/10/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/10/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/10/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/12/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/17/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/19/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/19/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/23/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/25/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/25/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/08/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/16/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/16/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/22/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/28/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/30/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/09/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/11/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/23/1997