Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/30/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/30/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/30/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 04/30/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/30/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/30/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 04/30/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/30/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/13/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/17/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/17/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/16/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/16/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/30/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/02/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/07/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/21/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 10/21/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 10/23/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/30/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/04/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 11/07/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/27/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/04/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/04/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/11/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/10/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/10/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/24/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/12/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/12/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/22/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/24/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/24/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/13/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/13/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/13/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew