Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/30/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 04/30/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 04/30/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/14/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/14/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/14/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/05/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/05/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/17/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/17/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/30/1997