Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/08/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/08/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/08/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/20/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/20/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/18/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/17/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/17/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/26/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/05/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/22/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/03/1998