Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/01/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/01/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/07/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/07/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/07/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/07/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/07/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/07/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/07/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/13/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/13/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/13/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/13/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/20/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/20/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/20/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/20/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/20/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/20/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/20/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/22/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/22/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/03/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/03/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/03/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/03/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/03/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/03/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/05/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/20/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/20/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/20/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/20/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 06/20/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/20/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/20/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/20/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/20/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/25/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/25/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/25/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/25/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/25/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/25/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/25/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/25/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 06/25/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/08/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/08/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/08/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/08/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/08/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/08/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/08/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/08/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/08/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/08/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 07/08/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/11/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/11/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/11/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/17/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/17/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/23/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/23/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/23/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/23/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/23/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/23/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/23/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/23/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/29/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/29/1997
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/29/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/31/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/31/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/03/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/03/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/09/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/09/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/09/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/09/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/09/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/09/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/11/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/11/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/11/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/11/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/18/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/18/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/18/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/18/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/24/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/24/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/29/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/29/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/29/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/30/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/24/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 11/13/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/13/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/20/1998