Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/01/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 05/01/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/01/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 05/01/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 05/01/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/01/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/13/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/13/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/13/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/13/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/14/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/14/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 05/14/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/14/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/19/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/19/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/19/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/19/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/19/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/19/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/19/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/19/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/19/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/19/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/27/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 05/27/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/27/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/27/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/27/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/27/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/19/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/19/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/19/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/19/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/19/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/19/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/25/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/10/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/10/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/25/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/25/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/25/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 11/05/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/24/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/18/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew