Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/15/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/15/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/15/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/17/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/17/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/17/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/17/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/17/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/17/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/17/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/26/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/22/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/22/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/22/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/22/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/31/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/31/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/26/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/26/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/06/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/06/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/29/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 10/29/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/05/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/08/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/13/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/27/1998
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/01/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/01/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/23/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/20/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 10/01/1998