Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 05/01/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 05/08/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/08/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/08/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/08/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/08/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/08/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/03/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/03/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/03/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/10/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/10/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/10/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/10/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/08/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/08/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/31/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/05/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/05/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 10/02/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 10/08/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/27/1998