Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/30/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/30/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/03/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/03/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/03/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/03/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/03/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/10/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/10/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/10/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/10/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/10/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/17/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/17/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/17/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/17/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/24/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/10/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/17/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/17/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/17/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/17/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/25/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/25/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/25/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/25/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/25/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/25/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/31/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/03/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/16/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/16/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/16/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/16/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/17/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/17/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/18/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/23/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/23/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/24/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/24/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/29/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 10/06/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/22/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 10/29/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/27/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/27/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/11/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/17/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/17/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/31/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/21/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/27/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/28/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/30/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/12/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/22/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/03/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/16/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/16/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/16/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/16/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/18/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/23/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/23/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 08/05/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/11/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/28/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/05/1998