Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/12/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/23/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/08/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/08/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/11/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/22/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/22/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/22/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/25/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/30/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/30/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/31/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/31/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/31/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/31/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/04/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/04/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/16/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/16/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/16/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/23/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/23/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/23/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/23/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/23/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/24/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/24/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/24/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/24/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/24/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/06/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/21/1997