Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/06/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/10/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/10/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/10/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/10/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/09/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/23/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/24/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/16/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/01/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/01/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 10/22/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/29/1997