Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/07/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/08/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/16/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/16/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/16/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/23/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/23/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/23/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/24/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/24/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/31/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/15/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/04/1997