Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/14/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/14/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/14/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/14/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/14/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/14/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/14/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/14/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/14/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 05/14/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/14/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/14/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/14/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/14/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/14/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/14/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/14/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 05/14/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/14/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/15/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/15/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/15/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/16/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/21/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/21/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/21/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/21/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/22/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/04/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/04/1997

Show cosponsors who withdrew