Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/22/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/17/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/07/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/13/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/13/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/13/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/13/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/13/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/31/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/31/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/31/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/31/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/31/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/31/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/31/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/31/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/31/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/31/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/31/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/31/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/31/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/31/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/31/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 08/03/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 08/03/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 08/03/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/03/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 08/04/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 08/04/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 08/04/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 08/04/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 08/04/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 08/04/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 08/04/1998