Refine your search

Refined by:

Colorado Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/14/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/17/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/11/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/09/1998