Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/22/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/22/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/13/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/13/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/13/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/31/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/31/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/31/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/31/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/31/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 08/03/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 08/04/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 08/04/1998