Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/13/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/13/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/13/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/19/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/11/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/31/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/31/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/31/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/31/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/31/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 08/03/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/03/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/04/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 08/04/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/04/1998