Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/22/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/17/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 08/03/1998