Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 11/13/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/31/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/03/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/04/1998