Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/13/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/13/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/13/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/31/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/31/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/31/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/31/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 08/03/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 08/03/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/04/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 08/04/1998