Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/14/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/14/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/14/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/14/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/22/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/22/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/22/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/22/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/22/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/22/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/22/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/22/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/22/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/22/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/22/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/22/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/22/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/17/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/17/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/26/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/29/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/29/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 11/13/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/13/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/13/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/13/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/13/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/13/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/13/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/13/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/13/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/13/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/13/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/13/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/13/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/13/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/13/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/13/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/13/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/13/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/13/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/13/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/13/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/13/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/13/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/13/1998
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/13/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/13/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/13/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/13/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/13/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/13/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/13/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/19/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/19/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/11/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/11/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/11/1998
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 07/31/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/31/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/31/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 07/31/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/31/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 07/31/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/31/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 08/03/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 08/03/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 08/03/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 08/03/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 08/03/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 08/03/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 08/03/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 08/03/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 08/03/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 08/03/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 08/03/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 08/03/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 08/03/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 08/03/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 08/03/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 08/03/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 08/03/1998
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 08/03/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 08/03/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 08/04/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 08/04/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 08/04/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 08/04/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 08/04/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/04/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 08/04/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 08/04/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 08/04/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 08/04/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/04/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 08/04/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 08/04/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/04/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/04/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 08/04/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/04/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 08/04/1998