Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/08/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/16/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/16/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/16/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/16/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/16/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/16/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/22/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/04/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/04/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/04/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/04/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/05/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/05/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/05/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/17/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/17/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/17/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/17/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/10/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/31/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/31/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/31/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/11/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/05/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/13/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/13/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/28/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/28/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/24/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/24/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/24/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/24/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/30/1998