Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/08/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/08/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/08/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/15/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 09/04/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/06/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/04/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/20/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/25/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew