Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
08/13/1997 Became Public Law No: 105-41.
08/13/1997 Signed by President.
08/01/1997 Presented to President.
07/24/1997 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8040-8041)
07/22/1997 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 422 - 3 (Roll no. 299).
05/13/1997 Introduced in House