Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/14/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/22/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/04/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/17/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/23/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/23/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/23/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/23/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/28/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/28/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/03/1998