Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/26/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/26/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/31/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/17/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/17/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/25/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/01/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/23/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/30/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/30/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/30/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/04/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 11/04/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/27/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/27/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/28/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 01/28/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/05/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/12/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/12/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/12/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/24/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/17/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/24/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/11/1998