Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/05/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/05/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/05/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/05/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 06/05/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/17/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/17/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/26/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/16/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/16/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/28/1997