Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/26/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/27/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/27/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/27/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/27/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/27/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/27/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/27/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/03/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/03/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 02/03/1998
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/03/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/03/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/03/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/24/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/24/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/24/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/17/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/17/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/17/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/17/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/21/1998