Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/14/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/14/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 05/14/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 05/14/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 05/14/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/14/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/03/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/03/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/03/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/03/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/04/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/04/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/04/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 06/04/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/04/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/04/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/19/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/08/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/10/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/11/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/17/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/17/1997