Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/14/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/14/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/14/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/14/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/14/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/22/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/10/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/08/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/08/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/09/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/09/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/11/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/11/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/11/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/15/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/15/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/17/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/24/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/24/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 07/25/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/29/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/30/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/05/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/05/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/07/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/07/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 10/09/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/31/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/31/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/31/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/31/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/31/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 10/31/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/31/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/31/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/31/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/31/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/31/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/31/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/31/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/31/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/31/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/31/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/31/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/31/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/31/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/31/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/31/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/31/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/05/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/08/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/17/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew