Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 05/15/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/20/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/20/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/20/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/20/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/20/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/20/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/20/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/20/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/20/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/08/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/08/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/08/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/11/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/15/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/15/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/23/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 07/24/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/08/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 09/08/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/16/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/02/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/13/1998