There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Worker Paycheck Fairness Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Worker Paycheck Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that workers have sufficient information about their rights regarding the payment of dues or fees to labor organizations and the uses of employee dues and fees by labor organizations.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/08/1997Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 105-397.
05/15/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
11/08/1997Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 231.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/08/1997Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 105-397.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
10/08/1997Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
10/08/1997Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
07/09/1997Committee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
06/11/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/15/1997Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (111)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 05/15/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/15/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/26/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/26/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/31/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/31/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/31/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/31/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/31/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/31/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/31/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/31/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/31/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/31/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 09/17/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/25/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 09/25/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/25/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/25/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/01/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/01/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/01/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/01/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/09/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 10/09/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/09/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 10/09/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/23/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/23/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/24/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/04/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/04/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/04/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/04/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/04/1997
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 11/04/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/07/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/07/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/08/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 11/08/1997

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce05/15/1997 Referred to
07/09/1997 Hearings by
10/08/1997 Markup by
11/08/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-397
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations06/11/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1625.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1625. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (11/08/1997)

Worker Paycheck Fairness Act - Requires a labor union accepting payment of any dues or fees from an employee as a condition of employment to secure from each employee a prior, voluntary, written authorization for any portion of such dues or fees which will be used for activities not necessary to performing the duties of exclusive representation in dealing with the employer on labor-management issues. Gives employees a right of civil action against any labor union which violates this requirement.

Requires employers to post notice relating to such requirement.

Amends the Labor-Management Reporting and Disclosure Act of 1959 to require every labor union to attribute and report expenses by function classification in detail necessary to allow its members to determine whether such expenses were necessary to performing the duties of exclusive representation in dealing with the employer on labor-management issues. Requires disclosure under such Act to employees required to pay any union dues or fees (under a union security agreement) as well as to union members.

Makes it unlawful for any labor organization to coerce, intimidate, threaten, interfere with, or retaliate against any employee in the exercise of, or on account of having exercised, any right granted or protected by this Act.