Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 05/15/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/15/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/26/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/26/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/31/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/31/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/31/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/31/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/31/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/31/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/31/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/31/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/31/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/31/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 09/17/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/25/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 09/25/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/25/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/25/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/01/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/01/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/01/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/01/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/09/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 10/09/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/09/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 10/09/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/23/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/23/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/24/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/04/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/04/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/04/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/04/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/04/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 11/04/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/07/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/07/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/08/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 11/08/1997