Committees: H.R.1635 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources05/15/1997 Referred to
05/20/1998 Markup by
06/03/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-559
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands05/21/1997 Referred to
07/22/1997 Hearings by
10/07/1997 Markup by
10/07/1997 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/10/1998 Referred to
06/25/1998 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Historic Preservation and Recreation06/10/1998 Referred to