Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/15/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/15/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/15/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/15/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/16/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/16/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/16/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/16/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/29/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/29/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/29/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/01/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/01/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 08/01/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/01/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/01/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/01/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 08/01/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 08/01/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/01/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 08/01/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 08/01/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 08/01/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/07/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/09/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/09/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 11/09/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/09/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/03/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/03/1998
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 02/03/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/03/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/03/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/03/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/03/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 04/01/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/01/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/01/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/01/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/12/1998