Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/08/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/08/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/08/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/08/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/08/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/08/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/08/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/08/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/08/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/08/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/08/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/08/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/08/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/08/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/08/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/21/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/21/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/21/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/21/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/21/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/21/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/21/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/21/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/21/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/21/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/21/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/21/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/21/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/21/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/21/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/21/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/21/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/21/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/21/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/21/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/21/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/21/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/21/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/21/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/21/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 05/21/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/21/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/21/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/21/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/30/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/30/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/30/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/30/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/30/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/30/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/30/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/30/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/30/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/30/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/30/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/30/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/30/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/30/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/30/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/30/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/30/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 07/30/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/05/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/05/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/05/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/05/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/05/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/05/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/05/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/05/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/05/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/05/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/05/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/05/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/05/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/05/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/05/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/05/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/05/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/18/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/18/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/18/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/18/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/18/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/07/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/07/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/07/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/07/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/07/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/28/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/28/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/28/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/31/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/31/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/31/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/31/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/31/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/31/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/06/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 11/06/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/07/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 11/08/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/08/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 11/08/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/08/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/28/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/26/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/27/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/27/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/27/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/27/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/27/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/29/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/29/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 07/29/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/29/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/29/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/30/1998