Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/22/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/03/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/03/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/22/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/04/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/11/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/11/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew