There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Popular Titles

Department of Veterans' Affairs Employment Discrimination bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Veterans Affairs Employment Discrimination Resolution and Adjudication Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Department of Veterans Affairs Employment Discrimination Resolution and Adjudication Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Veterans Affairs Employment Discrimination Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for improved and expedited procedures for resolving complaints of unlawful employment discrimination arising within the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/06/1997Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/02/1997Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 105-292.
05/22/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
10/07/1997SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs.
10/06/1997-2:59pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/06/1997-2:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/06/1997-2:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/06/1997-2:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/06/1997-2:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8369-8373)
10/06/1997-2:40pmHouseMr. Stump moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/02/1997HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 166.
10/02/1997HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 105-292.
09/30/1997HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/30/1997HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/17/1997HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
05/22/1997HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/22/1997HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/22/1997 Referred to
07/17/1997 Hearings by
09/30/1997 Markup by
10/02/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-292
Senate Veterans' Affairs10/07/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1703.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1703. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/06/1997)

Department of Veterans Affairs Employment Discrimination Resolution and Adjudication Act - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide that the employment discrimination complaint resolution system within the Department of Veterans Affairs be established and administered so as to encourage timely and fair resolution of concerns and complaints and that the system is administered in an objective, fair, and effective manner as perceived by Department employees. Directs the Secretary to impose appropriate disciplinary measures for Department employees who engage in unlawful employment discrimination, including retaliation against employees asserting equal employment opportunity (EEO) rights. Limits to 40 the number of Department employees whose duties include EEO counseling functions as well as other unrelated functions. Allows such splitting of functions only at Department facilities located in remote geographic locations. Directs the Secretary to submit to the Congress reports on the implementation and operation of the EEO system within the Department.

Establishes in the Department an Office of Employment Discrimination Complaint Adjudication headed by a Director who shall be responsible for making final agency decisions on the merits of any unlawful employment discrimination complaints filed by a Department employee. Requires the Director to report to the Secretary or Deputy Secretary of Veterans Affairs when the Director has reason to believe that there has been retaliation against an employee asserting EEO rights. Requires the Director to submit to the Secretary and the Congress reports on the implementation and operation of the Office.

Establishes an independent panel to review and report to the veterans' committees on the EEO and sexual harassment practices and procedures within the Department and to make recommendations on improvements.