Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/22/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/11/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/11/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/19/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/19/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/16/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/16/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/30/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/16/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/16/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/18/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/18/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 09/23/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/23/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/23/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/23/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/23/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/23/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/23/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/23/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/23/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/24/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/29/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/26/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/26/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/26/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/26/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 02/26/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/26/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/26/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/05/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/05/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 03/05/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/05/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/11/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/11/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/17/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/23/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/21/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/21/1998