Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/22/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/20/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/20/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/20/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/20/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/20/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/20/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/20/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/20/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 06/20/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/20/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/26/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/17/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/17/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/17/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/17/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/17/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/25/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/25/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/25/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/25/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/25/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/25/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/25/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/31/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/31/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 07/31/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/11/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/11/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/29/1997