Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/05/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/05/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/24/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/24/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/24/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/24/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/24/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/24/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/10/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/17/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/25/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/25/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/30/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/30/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/30/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/31/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/04/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/04/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/04/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/04/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/04/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/04/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/10/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/10/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/10/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/29/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/29/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/29/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/29/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/29/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/29/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/29/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 10/30/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/30/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/30/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/30/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/30/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/30/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/30/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/30/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 10/30/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/07/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/07/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/13/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/28/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 01/28/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/28/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/05/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/05/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/05/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/05/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/01/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/01/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/01/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/25/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/25/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/08/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/20/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/20/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/20/1998