Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 05/22/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/03/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/04/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/04/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/10/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/10/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/12/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/12/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/17/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/17/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/17/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/19/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/19/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/19/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/26/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/08/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/11/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/03/1997