Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/22/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/05/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/05/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/11/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/11/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/11/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/16/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/16/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/23/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/26/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/14/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/14/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/17/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/17/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/17/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/17/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/22/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/22/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/22/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 07/23/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/25/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/30/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/05/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/08/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/11/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/16/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/24/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/01/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/04/1997