Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/22/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/22/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 05/22/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 05/22/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 05/22/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 06/04/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/04/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/04/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/11/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 07/30/1997