Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/03/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/11/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/11/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/18/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/18/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/26/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/26/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/09/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/09/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/16/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/16/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/16/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/17/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/29/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/03/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/08/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/09/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/17/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/17/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/17/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/24/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/01/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/01/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/01/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/01/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/01/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/06/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/06/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/06/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/29/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/04/1998