There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Comprehensive Preventive Health and Promotion Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to establish a schedule of preventive health care services and to provide for coverage of such services in accordance with such schedule under private health insurance plans and health benefit programs of the Federal Government, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/07/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date
02/24/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/03/1997Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
02/03/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on National Security
01/23/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
01/22/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform and Oversight
01/17/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/07/1997Referred to House National Security
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Referred to House Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform and Oversight, Veterans' Affairs, and National Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E20)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/26/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/29/1997

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce01/07/1997 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment01/23/1997 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/07/1997 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health01/17/1997 Referred to
House Government Reform and Oversight01/07/1997 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Human Resources01/22/1997 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs01/07/1997 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/24/1997 Referred to
House National Security01/07/1997 Referred to
House National Security Subcommittee on Military Personnel02/03/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.177.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.177. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/07/1997)

Comprehensive Preventive Health and Promotion Act of 1997 - Mandates establishment and annual revision of a schedule of recommended preventive health care services.

Requires each carrier and employer health benefit plan to include coverage for those services. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to impose a tax on the failure of a carrier or an employer plan to comply.

Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to include those services in the definition of "medical and other health services."

Amends title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act to mandate Medicaid coverage of the services and, in some circumstances, for: (1) home and community care for functionally disabled elderly individuals; and (2) community supported living arrangements services.

Amends Federal law relating to health care services for veterans to include the services under this Act in the definition of "medical services." Regulates provision of the preventive services on an outpatient basis.

Amends Federal law relating to health insurance for Federal employees to add the services to the list of benefits which may be provided under service or indemnity benefit plans.

Amends Federal law relating to medical care for dependents of members of the uniformed services to add coverage of the preventive services.

Mandates: (1) grants to counties for a project to demonstrate the effectiveness of providing those services to improve and reduce health costs; (2) dissemination of information on the benefits of practicing preventive care; (3) grants to employers to establish and conduct on-site workshops on health care promotion for employees; and (4) a program of on-site workshops on health care promotion for Federal employees.