Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/04/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/04/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/11/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/11/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/11/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/11/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/30/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/30/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/30/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/24/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/24/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/24/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/24/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/24/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/24/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/24/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/24/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/13/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/13/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/13/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/13/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/13/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/13/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/13/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/13/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/13/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/04/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/04/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/01/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/05/1998