Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/17/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/19/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/19/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/20/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/26/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/15/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 09/23/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/11/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/17/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/28/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/14/1998