Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/17/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/19/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/10/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/10/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/22/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/25/1997