Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/04/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/04/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/11/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/11/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/11/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/17/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/17/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/19/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/19/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/19/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/19/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/19/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/19/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/20/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/20/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/20/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/26/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/10/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/10/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/15/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/22/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/22/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/25/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/08/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/16/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/23/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/23/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 09/23/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/26/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/13/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/10/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/11/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/17/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/17/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/17/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/22/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/28/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/30/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/03/1998